UT SB0276 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset and Repeal Date Code Corrections
Title
Sunset and Repeal Date Code Corrections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-03-12 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-01 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-03-01 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-03-01 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2024-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2024-03-01 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-03-01 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-02-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-27 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-27 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32B | 2 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32B | 2 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32B | 2 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 232 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 249 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 254 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 267 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 272 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 277 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 280 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 219 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 249 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 259 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 264 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 272 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 273 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 277 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 279 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 280 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |