UT SB0223 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to Charter School Governance
Title
Modifications to Charter School Governance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-02-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |