UT SB0193 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Defense Prohibition
Title
Criminal Defense Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-14 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-09 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-09 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-09 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |