UT SB0189 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0189S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-01 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-01 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Oncology Insurance Amendments
Title
Oncology Insurance Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTBUS |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-13 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0189S01 (Replaced by) 2013-03-12 - House/ substituted in HSUB