UT SB0177S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0177
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Highway Designation Amendments
Title
Highway Designation Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTEDW |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDW |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTEDW |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTEDW |
2013-02-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTEDW |
2013-02-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTEDW |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDW |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ substituted by Rules in SSTRUL |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTRUL |
2013-02-21 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTRUL |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-08 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0177 (Replaces) 2013-02-25 - Senate/ substituted by Rules in SSUB