UT SB0177 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Behavioral Health Crisis Response Amendments
Title
Behavioral Health Crisis Response Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-16 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-16 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-16 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Crisis Line
Department of Human Services
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Professionals
Human Services
Local Mental Health Authorities
Local Substance Abuse Authorities
Mental Health
Mental Health Facilities
Mental Health Professionals
Substance Abuse
Substance Abuse and Mental Health
Suicide
Department of Human Services
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Professionals
Human Services
Local Mental Health Authorities
Local Substance Abuse Authorities
Mental Health
Mental Health Facilities
Mental Health Professionals
Substance Abuse
Substance Abuse and Mental Health
Suicide