UT SB0158 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Venture Capital Enhancement Act Amendments
Title
Utah Venture Capital Enhancement Act Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTWED | |
2010-03-01 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTWED | |
2010-02-26 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTWED | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-25 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0158.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/sbillint/sb0158.pdf |