UT SB0148 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Guaranteed Asset Protection Waivers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guaranteed Asset Protection Waivers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-29 Governor Signed in ELTGOV
2010-03-18 Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2010-03-18 Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2010-03-03 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2010-03-03 Senate/ received from House in SPRES
2010-03-03 House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2010-03-03 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2010-03-02 House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL
2010-03-01 House/ 2nd reading in HSTBUS
2010-02-26 House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS
2010-02-24 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2010-02-23 Senate/ to House in HCLERK
2010-02-23 Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2010-02-22 Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND
2010-02-11 Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2010-02-10 Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTWED
2010-02-08 Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTWED
2010-02-08 Senate/ to standing committee in SSTWED
2010-02-05 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2010-02-04 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2010-02-04 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback