UT SB0143S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0143
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nail Technician Practice Amendments
Title
Nail Technician Practice Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2014-03-20 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-07 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-06 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-06 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2014-03-06 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-06 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-06 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR |
2014-03-06 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTBUS |
2014-03-05 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2014-03-03 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-02-28 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S3RD |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S3RD |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND |
2014-02-19 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND |
2014-02-18 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTBUS |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2014-02-13 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTBUS |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTBUS |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTBUS |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-01-24 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0143 (Replaces) 2014-02-18 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB