UT SB0136S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0136
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Construction Trades Licensing Modifications
Title
Construction Trades Licensing Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in SSTRUL |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTBUS |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in SSTBUS |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTBUS |
2013-02-07 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTBUS |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTBUS |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTBUS |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-01-28 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0136 (Replaces) 2013-03-08 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in SSUB