UT SB0136 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0136S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-08 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-08 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Construction Trades Licensing Modifications
Title
Construction Trades Licensing Modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in SSUB |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTBUS |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTBUS |
2013-01-30 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTBUS |
2013-01-30 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTBUS |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-01-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-01-28 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0136S01 (Replaced by) 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0136.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/sbillint/sb0136.pdf |