UT SB0132 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child Care Center Sales Tax Exemption
Title
Child Care Center Sales Tax Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House/ failed (Y: 34 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - House/ failed (Y: 37 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House/ failed (Y: 37 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate file for bills not passed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate file for bills not passed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ motion to reconsider in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-23 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-23 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-26 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Child Care Licensing
Department of Health
Health
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax
Sales Tax Exemptions
Department of Health
Health
Revenue and Taxation
Sales and Use Tax
Sales Tax Exemptions
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 12 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 259 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |