UT SB0112 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Title
Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | House Comm - Held in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-08 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-08 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-22 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business
Department of Commerce
Health
Health Care Professionals
Occupational and Professional Licensing
Occupational Therapists
Department of Commerce
Health
Health Care Professionals
Occupational and Professional Licensing
Occupational Therapists