UT SB0109 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Corrections Modifications
Title
Corrections Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-02-16 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-14 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-14 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-14 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2024-02-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2024-02-14 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2024-02-14 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2024-02-14 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-02-08 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-02-08 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-02 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-01 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-01-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Archives and Records
Arrest and Detention
Board of Pardons and Parole
Commission on Criminal and Juvenile Justice
Correctional Facilities
Crimes
Department of Corrections
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Public Safety
Domestic Violence
Fines
Government Records
Health and Human Services
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Homicide
Housing
Inmates
Kidnapping
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Medical Records
Parole
Probation
Public Safety
Punishment
Restitution
Sentencing
Sexual Offenses
Substance Abuse and Mental Health
Arrest and Detention
Board of Pardons and Parole
Commission on Criminal and Juvenile Justice
Correctional Facilities
Crimes
Department of Corrections
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Public Safety
Domestic Violence
Fines
Government Records
Health and Human Services
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Homicide
Housing
Inmates
Kidnapping
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Medical Records
Parole
Probation
Public Safety
Punishment
Restitution
Sentencing
Sexual Offenses
Substance Abuse and Mental Health
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 22 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26B | 4 | 325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 13 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 13 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 13 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 13 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 13 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 13 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 13 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 20 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 20 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 27 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |