UT SB0053 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Guardianship, Conservatorship, and Other Protective Arrangements Act
Title
Uniform Guardianship, Conservatorship, and Other Protective Arrangements Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-27 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Abuse, Neglect, or Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Courts
Judiciary
Minors
Uniform Laws
Uniform Probate Code
Courts
Judiciary
Minors
Uniform Laws
Uniform Probate Code
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/static/SB0053.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/sbillint/SB0053.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/SB0053.fn.pdf |