UT HJR022 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Recognizing the 75th Anniversary of the Utah Highway Patrol
Title
Joint Resolution Recognizing the 75th Anniversary of the Utah Highway Patrol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 1st, 2nd, & 3rd readings/suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV | |
2010-02-22 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-17 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-16 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ 1st, 2nd, & 3rd readings/ suspension in S3RD | |
2010-02-16 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-16 | House/ 3rd reading in HSPEC | |
2010-02-09 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2010-02-09 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-08 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-05 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |