UT HJR014 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 19 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 19 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution to Harden the Utah and United States Electrical Grids
Title
Joint Resolution to Harden the Utah and United States Electrical Grids
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-20 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-19 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-01 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-01 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-02-28 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2019-02-28 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-02-15 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2019-02-07 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-31 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-29 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-29 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |