UT HB0517 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Inmate Program Amendments
Title
Inmate Program Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 38 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-03 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-02-27 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-27 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-27 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Crimes
Department of Corrections
Education
Higher Education
Human Services
Inmates
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Nontraditional students
Offender Registries
Rehabilitation Services
Sexual Offenses
Substance Abuse
Substance Use Disorder Treatment
Workforce Services
Department of Corrections
Education
Higher Education
Human Services
Inmates
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Nontraditional students
Offender Registries
Rehabilitation Services
Sexual Offenses
Substance Abuse
Substance Use Disorder Treatment
Workforce Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63M | 7 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
64 | 13 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |