UT HB0465 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cultural and Community Engagement Amendments
Title
Cultural and Community Engagement Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Winder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Rulemaking
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Cultural and Community Engagement
Legislative Operations
Legislative Publications
Libraries
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Cultural and Community Engagement
Legislative Operations
Legislative Publications
Libraries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 7 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 208 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 7 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/static/HB0465.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/hbillint/HB0465.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2022/HB0465.fn.pdf |