UT HB0449 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bereavement Leave Modifications
Title
Bereavement Leave Modifications
Sponsors
Rep. Rex Shipp [R] | Sen. Wayne Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-10 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-10 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-08 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-04 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-28 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-28 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Counties
Division of Human Resource Management
Education
Government Operations (State Issues)
Higher Education
Local Government Employees
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
State Officers and Employees
Division of Human Resource Management
Education
Government Operations (State Issues)
Higher Education
Local Government Employees
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
State Officers and Employees
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 3 | 1103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 33 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 1 | 508 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53B | 1 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53B | 1 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63A | 17 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |