UT HB0422 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Political Subdivision Civil Liability Amendments
Title
Political Subdivision Civil Liability Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 38 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ held in House Docket Clerk |
2021-03-02 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Counties
County Officers
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Municipal Officers
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Safety
County Officers
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Municipal Officers
Municipalities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Safety