UT HB0412 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Inmate Education Amendments
Title
Inmate Education Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | House Comm - Held in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |