UT HB0361 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' Compensation Act Amendments
Title
Workers' Compensation Act Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Business and Labor Committee |
2023-02-09 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Business and Labor Committee |
2023-02-06 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2023-02-06 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-02 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-02 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-01 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Law Judges
Administrative Procedures
Business
Contracts and Obligations
Labor and Employment
Labor Commission
Workers' Compensation
Administrative Procedures
Business
Contracts and Obligations
Labor and Employment
Labor Commission
Workers' Compensation
Code Citations
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/static/HB0361.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0361.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/HB0361.fn.pdf |