UT HB0351 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic Violence Modifications
Title
Domestic Violence Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-18 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ held in House Docket Clerk |
2022-02-17 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-17 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-17 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-16 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Commission on Criminal and Juvenile Justice
Crimes
Department of Public Safety
Domestic Violence
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization
Protective Orders
Crimes
Department of Public Safety
Domestic Violence
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization
Protective Orders
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63I | 1 | 263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 7 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 7 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 7 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 7 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 7 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |