UT HB0350 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Workforce Development Programs Reporting Requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workforce Development Programs Reporting Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2018-03-08HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2018-03-06HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee
2018-03-05HouseHouse Comm - Returned to Rules in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2018-02-14HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2018-02-13HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2018-02-12HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2018-02-12HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee
2018-02-08HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2018-02-08HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2018-02-07 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-02-07 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-02-07 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback