UT HB0340 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Forensic DNA Privacy Amendments
Title
Forensic DNA Privacy Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House Comm - Held in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-07 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-07 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Background Checks
Criminal Procedure
Department of Public Safety
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officers
Public Safety
Victims
Criminal Procedure
Department of Public Safety
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Peace Officers
Public Safety
Victims