UT HB0298 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Land Use Authority Notification of Canal Development
Title
Land Use Authority Notification of Canal Development
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Ferry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB | |
2010-02-19 | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTNAE | |
2010-02-08 | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE | |
2010-02-08 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-05 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0298.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0298.pdf |