UT HB0281 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Credit for Alternative Fuel Vehicles
Title
Tax Credit for Alternative Fuel Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-13 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-07 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-07 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Air Quality
Clean Fuels
Environment
Income Tax
Motor Vehicles
Revenue and Taxation
Tax Credits
Transportation
Clean Fuels
Environment
Income Tax
Motor Vehicles
Revenue and Taxation
Tax Credits
Transportation
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/HB0281.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HB0281.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HB0281.fn.pdf |