UT HB0279 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County Recorder Amendments
Title
County Recorder Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-03-05 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-05 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2010-03-05 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-05 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-04 | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK | |
2010-03-04 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2010-02-23 | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTGOP | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTGOP | |
2010-02-18 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-18 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-18 | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-09 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-09 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPOL | |
2010-02-05 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTPOL | |
2010-02-05 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-04 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-02 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |