UT HB0230S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0230
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency Vehicle Operators Training Requirements
Title
Emergency Vehicle Operators Training Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-08 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-22 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-21 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2013-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-11 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-11 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-08 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-08 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2013-03-08 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-08 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2013-03-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-08 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-07 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK |
2013-03-07 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTHHS |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTHHS |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-02-25 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSEC |
2013-02-22 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSEC |
2013-02-22 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-02-22 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-02-22 | House | House/ 3rd reading in HCON |
2013-02-20 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HCON |
2013-02-20 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in HSTHHS |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTHHS |
2013-02-19 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTHHS |
2013-02-19 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS |
2013-02-19 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTHHS |
2013-02-19 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in HSTHHS |
2013-02-13 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS |
2013-02-12 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-06 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0230 (Replaces) 2013-02-20 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in HSUB