UT HB0223 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTBUS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTBUS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic Beverage Control Act and Restaurant Licenses
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Control Act and Restaurant Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-22 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2010-01-19 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-09 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-08 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2009-11-24 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0223.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0223.pdf |