UT HB0193 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Occupations and Professions Amendments
Title
Occupations and Professions Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-17 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-02-26 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-25 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES | |
2010-02-24 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS | |
2010-02-09 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-08 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-08 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-02 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-02 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2010-01-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-23 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-23 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |