UT HB0188 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voter Signature Verification Amendments
Title
Voter Signature Verification Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-15 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Election Administration
Election Law
Electronic Databases
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
New Rulemaking Authority
Voting and Voter Registration
Election Administration
Election Law
Electronic Databases
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
New Rulemaking Authority
Voting and Voter Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20A | 5 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 5 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 5 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |