UT HB0152 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Online Prescribing, Dispensing, and Facilitation Licensing Act Repealer
Title
Online Prescribing, Dispensing, and Facilitation Licensing Act Repealer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-03-13 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-03-13 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-14 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-14 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-06 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-06 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2023-02-06 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2023-02-06 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-27 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-01-27 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2023-01-27 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2023-01-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Consent Calendar |
2023-01-25 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2023-01-25 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-24 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-24 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-24 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-11 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-12-29 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 60 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 83 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 83 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 83 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 83 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 83 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 83 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 83 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 83 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 83 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 83 | 308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 83 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 83 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 83 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 83 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |