UT HB0138 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Post Council Membership Amendments
Title
Post Council Membership Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-03 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-03 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-03 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-03 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-03 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-31 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-28 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-12 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |