UT HB0129 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Navigable Water Determinations
Title
Navigable Water Determinations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-17 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-11 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-11 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Rulemaking
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Department of Natural Resources
Fishing
Forestry, Fire, and State Lands
Hunting
Natural Resources
Public Lands
Sovereign Lands
Water
Wildlife
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Department of Natural Resources
Fishing
Forestry, Fire, and State Lands
Hunting
Natural Resources
Public Lands
Sovereign Lands
Water
Wildlife