UT HB0128 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Accumulated Fund Balance Amendments
Title
Local Accumulated Fund Balance Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-11 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-11 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-10 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-17 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-17 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-12 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-02-12 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-02-12 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-01 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2021-01-29 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2021-01-29 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-11 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-11 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 6 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13 | 512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 36 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |