UT HB0127 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motorcycle Right-of-way Amendments
Title
Motorcycle Right-of-way Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-18 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-18 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-18 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-12 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Transportation Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-20 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-09 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-09 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-09 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |