UT HB0112 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marriage Self-solemnization Amendments
Title
Marriage Self-solemnization Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-01 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 1 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 1 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |