UT HB0098 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Offenses Against the Administration of Government Amendments
Title
Offenses Against the Administration of Government Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Hall [R] | Sen. Todd Weiler [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-03-23 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2020-03-23 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-20 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-12 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-11 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2020-03-11 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2020-03-11 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-24 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-24 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-24 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-18 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-18 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-01-31 | House | House Comm - Held in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Criminal Code
Government Operations (State Issues)
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Public Officers
State Officers and Employees
Government Operations (State Issues)
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Public Officers
State Officers and Employees