UT HB0088S01 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0088
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0088S02
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0088S02
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Land Use Amendments
Title
Land Use Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 40 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 40 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-03-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-11 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2013-03-08 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-03-08 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in HSTRUL |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-07 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in H3RDHB |
2013-03-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in H3RDHB |
2013-03-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSTGOC |
2013-03-04 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTGOC |
2013-03-04 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2013-03-04 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2013-03-04 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in HSTGOC |
2013-03-01 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTGOC |
2013-02-26 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC |
2013-02-01 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-01-28 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0088 (Replaces) 2013-03-05 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
HB0088S02 (Replaced by) 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
HB0088S02 (Replaced by) 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV