UT HB0088 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Agriculture Sustainability Task Force

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture Sustainability Task Force

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-10 House/ filed in HFILE
2011-03-10 Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK
2011-03-03 Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2011-02-28 Senate/ circled in S2ND
2011-02-24 Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2011-02-23 Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTNAE
2011-02-17 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2011-02-17 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2011-02-17 House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB
2011-02-17 House/ motion to reconsider passed in HCLERK
2011-02-17 House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2011-02-09 House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB
2011-02-08 House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTNAE
2011-02-04 House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL
2011-02-03 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2011-01-31 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2011-01-28 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2011-01-28 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback