UT HB0075 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0075S02
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-04 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-04 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Occupational and Professional Licensing Amendments
Title
Occupational and Professional Licensing Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB |
2013-02-27 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTBUS |
2013-02-27 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-02-25 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTBUS |
2013-02-15 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS |
2013-02-14 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-01-25 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2013-01-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-01-21 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0075S02 (Replaced by) 2013-03-14 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0075.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2013/bills/hbillint/hb0075.pdf |