UT HB0075S02 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0075
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0075S03
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0075S03
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Occupational and Professional Licensing Amendments
Title
Occupational and Professional Licensing Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-02-27 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-05 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ motion to reconsider in HCLERK |
2013-03-05 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-03-04 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSTBUS |
2013-03-01 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-03-01 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-02-27 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTBUS |
2013-02-27 | House | House Comm - Held in HSTBUS |
2013-02-27 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2013-02-25 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTBUS |
2013-02-25 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTBUS |
2013-02-25 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in HSTBUS |
2013-02-15 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS |
2013-02-14 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-01-28 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-01-21 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-01-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0075 (Replaces) 2013-03-04 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB
HB0075S03 (Replaced by) 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
HB0075S03 (Replaced by) 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV