UT HB0074 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
End of Life Prescription Amendments
Title
End of Life Prescription Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-15 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Adult Services
Aging Services
Department of Health
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Professionals
Human Services
Osteopathic Physicians and Surgeons
Pharmaceuticals
Pharmacists
Physicians and Surgeons
Vital Statistics
Aging Services
Department of Health
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Professionals
Human Services
Osteopathic Physicians and Surgeons
Pharmaceuticals
Pharmacists
Physicians and Surgeons
Vital Statistics
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63G | 2 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |