UT HB0044 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
CCJJ Reporting Requirements
Title
CCJJ Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-11 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-11 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-10 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-16 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-05 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-02-05 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-02-05 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-20 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ held in House Docket Clerk |
2021-01-19 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-06 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-12-21 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Arrest and Detention
Commission on Criminal and Juvenile Justice
Department of Corrections
Department of Public Safety
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Commission on Criminal and Juvenile Justice
Department of Corrections
Department of Public Safety
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice