UT HB0034 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tanning for Minors
Title
Tanning for Minors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 41 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House/ failed (Y: 33 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 41 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House/ failed (Y: 33 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-13 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-13 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-02-13 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-01-29 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-01-29 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-01-28 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-01-28 | House | House/ motion to reconsider in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2020-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2020-01-16 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-12-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |