UT HB0014 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School Threat Penalty Amendments
Title
School Threat Penalty Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Wilcox [R] | Sen. Don Ipson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-03-08 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2024-03-08 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-07 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-28 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-28 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-28 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2024-02-27 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-27 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 3nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-01-16 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-01-16 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-12-18 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-12-18 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-12-18 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-12-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-12-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53G | 8 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 9 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |