UT HB0011 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water Efficient Landscaping Requirements
Title
Water Efficient Landscaping Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 51 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 51 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-03-08 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2024-03-08 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-07 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-22 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-22 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-22 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-22 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2024-02-21 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-21 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2024-02-21 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2024-02-21 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2024-02-20 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-20 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-20 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-20 | Senate | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-01-26 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-01-23 | House | House/ held in House Docket Clerk |
2024-01-23 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-01-23 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2024-01-19 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2024-01-18 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2024-01-18 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2024-01-12 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2024-01-10 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-12-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-12-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |