UT HB0006 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Agency Compensation Appropriations
Title
State Agency Compensation Appropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-11 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-03-11 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-10 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2010-03-09 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2010-03-09 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-03-09 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-09 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-08 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2010-03-08 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-03-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |